Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 02/04/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/06/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-33] 04/09/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/24/2013