Refine your search

Refined by:

Georgia Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 06/04/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/04/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 07/23/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/30/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/30/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/12/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 11/19/2013