Refine your search

Refined by:

North Carolina Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/18/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/04/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 06/14/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/18/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/17/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 07/17/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 07/24/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 07/16/2014