Refine your search

Refined by:

Ohio Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 03/18/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/25/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 07/08/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/18/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 07/23/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 09/09/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 01/27/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/25/2014