Refine your search

Refined by:

Pennsylvania Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/19/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 04/09/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 06/12/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 06/12/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/12/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 06/20/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 07/10/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 11/12/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 01/07/2014