Refine your search

Refined by:

Wisconsin Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/12/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 05/06/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/04/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/25/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/09/2013