Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/12/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/15/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/18/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 03/25/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 04/09/2013
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 04/09/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/11/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/16/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 04/16/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 04/30/2013
Rep. Duffy, Sean P. [R-WI-7] 05/06/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/08/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 05/14/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/16/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 05/16/2013
Rep. Radel, Trey [R-FL-19] 05/20/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 05/20/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 05/23/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 06/04/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/04/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/04/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 06/06/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 06/11/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 06/12/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 06/12/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 06/12/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/13/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 06/14/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 06/19/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 06/20/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/24/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/25/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/25/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/28/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 07/08/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 07/08/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/08/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 07/08/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 07/08/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/09/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 07/10/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 07/10/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/16/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/17/2013
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 07/17/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 07/17/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/18/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 07/19/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 07/23/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 07/23/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 07/23/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/23/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 07/24/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 07/24/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 07/25/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 07/25/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/30/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 07/31/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 07/31/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 08/01/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/09/2013
Rep. Smith, Jason T. [R-MO-8] 09/09/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 09/09/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 09/09/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 09/16/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 09/18/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 09/18/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/19/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 09/27/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 10/04/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 10/04/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/08/2013
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 11/12/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 11/13/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 11/18/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 11/20/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 01/07/2014
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 01/27/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 07/16/2014
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50] 07/23/2014
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 07/23/2014
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 07/31/2014