Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3]* 03/07/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 03/07/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 03/07/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7]* 03/07/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11] 03/13/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 04/10/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 07/09/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 07/09/2013
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 07/16/2013