Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 04/25/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 04/25/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/25/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 04/25/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/25/2013
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 05/09/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 06/26/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 07/16/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 07/16/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 07/16/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/22/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 07/30/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/31/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 08/02/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/13/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 12/05/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 09/09/2014