Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 03/07/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 03/07/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/07/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 03/07/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/12/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/12/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/12/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/14/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/14/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/14/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 03/18/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/18/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 03/20/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/20/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/20/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 04/10/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/16/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 04/16/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/17/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/23/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/23/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 04/23/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 04/23/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 04/23/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 05/08/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 05/16/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/21/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/24/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 09/19/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 05/09/2014