Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 03/07/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/19/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 03/20/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/20/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 03/25/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/25/2013
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-12] 03/25/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 03/25/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/25/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/25/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/25/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/09/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 04/09/2013