Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 03/07/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 03/07/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/04/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/06/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/10/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 07/15/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/10/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 09/16/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 09/26/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 10/22/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 10/30/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/03/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/09/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 06/10/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 06/10/2014