Refine your search

Refined by:

Florida Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 01/14/2013
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 02/25/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12] 03/05/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/12/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 05/15/2013