Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 03/11/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15]* 03/11/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 03/11/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/12/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/19/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 05/20/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/18/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 01/27/2014