Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/15/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/25/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 05/06/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/06/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 06/04/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 09/11/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 10/28/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/10/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 09/11/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 11/19/2014