Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-8]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 01/14/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 01/14/2013
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 01/22/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/22/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 01/23/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 02/15/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 02/28/2013
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 02/28/2013