Refine your search

8 results for Major Actions
Date Major Actions
12/18/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-237.
12/18/2014 Signed by President.
12/12/2014 Presented to President.
12/09/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/09/2014 Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6463)
04/23/2013 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 409 - 0 (Roll no. 118).(text: CR H2169-2171)
04/19/2013 Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 113-43.
03/12/2013 Introduced in House