Refine your search

Showing 8 of 8 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
12/19/2014 Became Public Law No: 113-287.
12/19/2014 Signed by President.
12/18/2014 Presented to President.
12/15/2014 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/15/2014 Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6867)
04/23/2013 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 409 - 0 (Roll no. 119).(text: CR H2171-2227)
04/19/2013 Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 113-44.
03/12/2013 Introduced in House