There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To enact title 54, United States Code, "National Park Service and Related Programs", as positive law.


Actions Overview (8)

Date Actions Overview
12/19/2014Became Public Law No: 113-287. (TXT | PDF)
12/19/2014Signed by President.
12/18/2014Presented to President.
12/15/2014Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/15/2014Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6867)
04/23/2013Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 409 - 0 (Roll no. 119).(text: CR H2171-2227)
04/19/2013Reported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 113-44.
03/12/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/19/2014Became Public Law No: 113-287. (TXT | PDF)
12/19/2014Signed by President.
12/18/2014HousePresented to President.
12/16/2014SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/15/2014SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/15/2014SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6867)
04/24/2013SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
04/23/2013-7:08pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 409 - 0 (Roll no. 119). (text: CR H2171-2227)
04/23/2013-7:08pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
04/23/2013-7:00pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2229-2230)
04/23/2013-4:40pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
04/23/2013-4:35pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1068.
04/23/2013-4:35pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2171-2228)
04/23/2013-4:35pmHouseMr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
04/19/2013HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 18.
04/19/2013HouseReported by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 113-44.
03/14/2013HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/14/2013HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/12/2013HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
03/12/2013HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 03/12/2013

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
House Judiciary03/12/2013 Referred to
03/14/2013 Markup by
04/19/2013 Reported by H. Rept. 113-44
Senate Judiciary04/24/2013 Referred to
12/15/2014 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.1068.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.1068. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 113-287 (12/19/2014)

(This measure has not been amended since it was passed by the House on April 23, 2013. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Enacts title 54 of the United States Code into positive law to be entitled "National Park Service and Related Programs."

Makes conforming changes to existing law and repeals specified provisions of specified laws.