Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-12]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 01/03/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 01/04/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 01/14/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 01/15/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 01/15/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 01/22/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/23/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/29/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 02/13/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 03/11/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-5] 06/27/2013
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 07/08/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 07/31/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 07/31/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 08/02/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 12/02/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 12/02/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 12/03/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 12/03/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 12/04/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 12/05/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 02/28/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 06/12/2014
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 06/18/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew