Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/21/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 03/21/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/21/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/21/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/21/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 03/21/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/21/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 04/11/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 04/11/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 04/11/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 04/11/2013
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 04/11/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 04/11/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/11/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/11/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 04/11/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/11/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/26/2013
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 04/26/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 04/26/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/26/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 05/14/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/14/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 05/14/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 05/14/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 06/20/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/20/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/20/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/20/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/20/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/20/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/20/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/20/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 07/10/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 07/23/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 10/07/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 10/07/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/07/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/21/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 11/21/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/21/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/15/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/16/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 01/16/2014
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 01/17/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/04/2014
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 02/05/2014
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/14/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/24/2014
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/24/2014
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 03/24/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 03/24/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 04/07/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 04/07/2014
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 04/10/2014
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/10/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 04/28/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/28/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 04/28/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/28/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 05/07/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/07/2014
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/09/2014
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 05/19/2014
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 05/23/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 06/09/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 06/12/2014
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 06/17/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/17/2014
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 06/19/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 06/25/2014
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 06/25/2014
Rep. McAllister, Vance M. [R-LA-5] 07/09/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 07/16/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/16/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 07/17/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/23/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/23/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 07/23/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 07/24/2014
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/24/2014
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 07/25/2014
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 07/29/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/30/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/30/2014
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 07/30/2014
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 09/09/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 09/09/2014
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 09/11/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/16/2014
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 09/16/2014
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 09/16/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 09/16/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 09/17/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 09/17/2014
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 09/17/2014
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/17/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 09/17/2014
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 09/17/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 09/17/2014
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 09/17/2014
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/17/2014
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 09/17/2014
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/17/2014
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 09/18/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 09/18/2014
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 09/18/2014
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2] 09/18/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 09/18/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 09/18/2014
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/18/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 09/18/2014
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 09/18/2014
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 09/18/2014
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 09/18/2014
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 09/18/2014
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 09/18/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 09/18/2014
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/18/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 09/18/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/18/2014
Rep. Jeffries, Hakeem S. [D-NY-8] 09/18/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/18/2014
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/19/2014
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23] 09/19/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 11/12/2014
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 11/12/2014
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 11/12/2014
Rep. Cook, Paul [R-CA-8] 11/12/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 11/12/2014
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/12/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 11/12/2014
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 11/12/2014
Rep. Hanna, Richard L. [R-NY-22] 11/12/2014
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 11/12/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/12/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 11/12/2014
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 11/12/2014
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 11/12/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 11/12/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 11/12/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 11/12/2014
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 11/12/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 11/13/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 11/13/2014
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 11/13/2014
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 11/18/2014
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 11/18/2014
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/18/2014
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 11/18/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 11/20/2014
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 12/10/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/10/2014
Rep. Tipton, Scott R. [R-CO-3] 12/11/2014