Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 03/20/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/20/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/20/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/21/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 03/21/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/09/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/09/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 04/09/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 04/09/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 04/09/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 04/09/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 04/09/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/09/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 04/17/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/17/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/17/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 04/26/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 04/26/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/26/2013
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 04/26/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/26/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 05/08/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 05/08/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/08/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 05/08/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/08/2013
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/08/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/08/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/08/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 05/14/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/14/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14] 05/21/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 05/21/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/21/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 05/23/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/25/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 06/25/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/08/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 07/08/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/08/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 07/18/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/30/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 07/30/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 08/01/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 10/01/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 10/08/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 10/08/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 10/16/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 10/16/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/16/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 10/30/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/14/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 11/14/2013
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 11/14/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 11/21/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 11/21/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 11/21/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 11/21/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/21/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 11/21/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 11/21/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 12/11/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 12/11/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/11/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 12/11/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 12/11/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 12/11/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 12/11/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 12/11/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 12/11/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 12/12/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17] 01/16/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/11/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 02/25/2014
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 02/25/2014
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 02/25/2014
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 02/25/2014
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/25/2014
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/25/2014
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 02/25/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/13/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 03/13/2014
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 03/26/2014
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 03/26/2014
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/26/2014
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 04/01/2014
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 04/03/2014
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 04/09/2014
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/09/2014
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/09/2014
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 04/09/2014
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 04/09/2014
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 04/09/2014
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-7] 04/10/2014
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/10/2014
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/10/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 04/28/2014
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/28/2014
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 04/28/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 04/28/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/28/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/28/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 04/28/2014
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/28/2014
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/28/2014
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/28/2014
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/07/2014
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 05/07/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 05/07/2014
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 05/07/2014
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/07/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 06/10/2014
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 06/10/2014
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 06/10/2014
Rep. Collins, Chris [R-NY-27] 06/10/2014
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/10/2014
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 06/10/2014
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 06/10/2014
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 06/10/2014
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 06/18/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 06/18/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 06/18/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 06/18/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 06/18/2014
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2] 06/18/2014
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 06/23/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/23/2014
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/23/2014
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/25/2014
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 06/25/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/25/2014
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 06/25/2014
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 07/11/2014
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 07/11/2014
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/11/2014
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 07/11/2014
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 07/11/2014
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/11/2014
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 07/11/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/22/2014
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 07/28/2014
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 07/30/2014
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 07/30/2014
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 07/30/2014
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/31/2014
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 07/31/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 08/01/2014
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 09/16/2014
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/18/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 09/18/2014
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 09/18/2014
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 09/18/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 11/13/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 11/13/2014
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 11/13/2014
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3] 11/13/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 11/13/2014
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 11/17/2014
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 11/17/2014
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 11/19/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 11/19/2014
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4] 11/19/2014
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 11/19/2014
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 11/19/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/01/2014
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 12/04/2014
Rep. Reed, Tom [R-NY-23] 12/08/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 12/11/2014
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 12/11/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 12/11/2014