Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 04/15/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/15/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 06/18/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 11/12/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 02/11/2014