Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/12/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 03/15/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 03/15/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/18/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 03/18/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/21/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 03/21/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 04/09/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 04/09/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/09/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1] 04/11/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 04/11/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 04/17/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 04/17/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 04/17/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 04/26/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 04/26/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/17/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/17/2013
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/17/2013
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/17/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/17/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 05/17/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8] 05/17/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 05/17/2013
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 05/17/2013
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/17/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 05/23/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/23/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/06/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 06/06/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/06/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/11/2013
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 06/11/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/13/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 06/14/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 06/20/2013
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/25/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 06/28/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 06/28/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 07/08/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/08/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/10/2013
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/18/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/19/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 07/19/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 07/22/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/30/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/30/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 08/02/2013
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/09/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/09/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/09/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 09/09/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 09/11/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 09/17/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/18/2013
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/18/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 09/28/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 09/28/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 10/28/2013

Show cosponsors who withdrew