Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 03/18/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/18/2013
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-8] 03/21/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/21/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 04/09/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 04/10/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 04/11/2013
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/12/2013
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 04/17/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 05/03/2013
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/03/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. Collins, Doug [R-GA-9] 05/09/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/03/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 06/12/2013
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/14/2013
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 06/20/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 06/27/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 07/16/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 09/09/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 09/09/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 09/12/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 09/19/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/25/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 09/26/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 10/11/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 12/04/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 12/12/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 01/08/2014
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 01/27/2014
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 01/28/2014
Rep. Woodall, Rob [R-GA-7] 03/11/2014
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 03/12/2014
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-48] 04/09/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 05/28/2014
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 06/18/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/19/2014
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 07/28/2014
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 11/13/2014