Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 04/16/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/16/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/17/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/04/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 06/27/2013