Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/12/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/18/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 03/18/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/18/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13] 03/18/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/18/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/18/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/20/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/20/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/20/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 03/20/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 04/10/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/16/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/16/2013