Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/15/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 02/11/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 02/11/2014
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/11/2014
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/11/2014
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/11/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 02/11/2014
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 02/11/2014
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13] 02/11/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 02/11/2014
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 02/11/2014
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11] 02/11/2014
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 02/11/2014
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 02/11/2014
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/11/2014
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/11/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 02/11/2014
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/11/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 02/11/2014
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 02/11/2014
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/11/2014
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 02/11/2014
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 02/11/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 02/25/2014
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 02/25/2014
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/25/2014
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 02/25/2014
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 02/25/2014
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 02/25/2014
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 02/27/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/27/2014
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 02/27/2014
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/27/2014
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/27/2014
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 02/27/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 02/27/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/27/2014
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/27/2014
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 02/27/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/27/2014
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 02/27/2014
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 02/27/2014
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 03/06/2014
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/06/2014
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/11/2014
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 03/13/2014
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/10/2014
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/11/2014
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 09/08/2014
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 12/01/2014