Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 03/13/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 04/10/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/06/2014
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 05/09/2014