There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Life at Conception Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To implement equal protection under the 14th article of amendment to the Constitution for the right to life of each born and preborn human person.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/12/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (3)

Date
04/08/2013Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/12/2013Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/12/2013Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (132)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-50]* 03/12/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Ellmers, Renee L. [R-NC-2]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Denham, Jeff [R-CA-10]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Kelly, Mike [R-PA-3]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Schweikert, David [R-AZ-6]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Crawford, Eric A. "Rick" [R-AR-1]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K., Sr. [R-TX-14]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Gosar, Paul A. [R-AZ-4] 03/18/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 03/18/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/18/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2] 03/18/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 03/18/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/18/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 03/18/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/18/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/20/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/09/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 04/09/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/11/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 04/11/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 04/11/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/25/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 04/25/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/20/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 05/21/2013
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/08/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17] 07/08/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 07/08/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/17/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 07/19/2013
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/19/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/23/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 07/23/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 07/23/2013
Rep. Gardner, Cory [R-CO-4] 07/23/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 07/25/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 07/25/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 07/25/2013
Rep. Hurt, Robert [R-VA-5] 07/25/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 07/30/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/30/2013
Rep. Renacci, James B. [R-OH-16] 07/30/2013
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-17] 07/30/2013
Rep. Scott, Austin [R-GA-8] 07/30/2013
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 08/01/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 08/01/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4] 08/01/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 08/02/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 08/02/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 08/02/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 08/02/2013
Rep. Fleischmann, Charles J. "Chuck" [R-TN-3] 09/10/2013
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/10/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/12/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large] 10/22/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 10/22/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 10/28/2013
Rep. Pittenger, Robert [R-NC-9] 10/28/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8] 10/30/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 11/12/2013
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 11/13/2013
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 12/03/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1] 12/09/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 12/19/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 01/07/2014
Rep. Cotton, Tom [R-AR-4] 01/08/2014
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 01/10/2014
Rep. McAllister, Vance M. [R-LA-5] 01/14/2014
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5] 01/27/2014
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 01/28/2014
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 01/28/2014
Rep. Herrera Beutler, Jaime [R-WA-3] 01/31/2014
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 02/04/2014
Rep. Byrne, Bradley [R-AL-1] 02/05/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/10/2014
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 02/11/2014
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 02/11/2014
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 02/25/2014
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/27/2014
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 02/27/2014
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 03/13/2014
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-14] 03/13/2014
Rep. Hudson, Richard [R-NC-8] 03/25/2014
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 03/25/2014
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/25/2014
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/25/2014
Rep. Stewart, Chris [R-UT-2] 05/19/2014
Rep. Jolly, David [R-FL-13] 05/19/2014
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/09/2014
Rep. Smith, Jason [R-MO-8] 07/10/2014

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/12/2013 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution and Civil Justice04/08/2013 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1091. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/12/2013)

Life at Conception Act - Declares that the right to life guaranteed by the Constitution is vested in each human being beginning at the moment of fertilization, cloning, or other moment at which an individual comes into being. Prohibits construing this Act to authorize the prosecution of any woman for the death of her unborn child.