Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Grimm, Michael G. [R-NY-11]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-13]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-11]* 03/12/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-14]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Fitzpatrick, Michael G. [R-PA-8]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-45]* 03/12/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/15/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10] 03/15/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 03/15/2013
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-16] 03/15/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9] 03/15/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44] 03/15/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/15/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 03/15/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 03/15/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/18/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25] 03/18/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 03/18/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/18/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 03/18/2013
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 03/18/2013
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/18/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/19/2013
Rep. Cardenas, Tony [D-CA-29] 03/19/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/19/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/19/2013
Rep. Peters, Scott H. [D-CA-52] 03/19/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/19/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/19/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 03/19/2013
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/09/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 04/09/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28] 04/09/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13] 04/09/2013
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-9] 04/09/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 04/09/2013
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-8] 04/09/2013
Rep. Marino, Tom [R-PA-10] 04/09/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 04/09/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/09/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-31] 04/09/2013
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-24] 04/09/2013
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 04/09/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 04/09/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 04/09/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/11/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 04/11/2013
Rep. Esty, Elizabeth H. [D-CT-5] 04/11/2013
Rep. Runyan, Jon [R-NJ-3] 04/11/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 04/11/2013
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 04/16/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 04/16/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 04/16/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/16/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/23/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 04/23/2013
Rep. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ-9] 04/23/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/23/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 04/26/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 04/26/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 04/26/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/26/2013
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-12] 04/26/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/26/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 04/26/2013
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 04/26/2013
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/03/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 05/03/2013
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-3] 05/03/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 05/03/2013
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-5] 05/03/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 05/07/2013
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/07/2013
Rep. Harris, Andy [R-MD-1] 05/07/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/13/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/13/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6] 05/13/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/13/2013
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-32] 05/13/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 05/13/2013
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-1] 05/13/2013
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/21/2013
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-35] 05/21/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/21/2013
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-6] 05/21/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/03/2013
Rep. Gabbard, Tulsi [D-HI-2] 06/03/2013
Rep. Sanford, Mark [R-SC-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 06/05/2013
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/05/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 06/13/2013
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/18/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 07/10/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/16/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 07/22/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 07/22/2013
Rep. Mulvaney, Mick [R-SC-5] 07/22/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/23/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 08/01/2013
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-15] 08/01/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23] 08/02/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 09/06/2013
Rep. Gowdy, Trey [R-SC-4] 09/06/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20] 09/16/2013
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/16/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 09/16/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 09/25/2013
Rep. Carney, John C., Jr. [D-DE-At Large] 09/25/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 09/28/2013
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/28/2013
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-7] 09/30/2013
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/30/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/30/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 09/30/2013
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 10/02/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 10/02/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 10/02/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/02/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 10/07/2013
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-33] 10/07/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16] 10/07/2013
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-30] 10/07/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/10/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 10/10/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 10/11/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 10/16/2013
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/16/2013
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37] 10/22/2013
Rep. Perry, Scott [R-PA-4] 10/22/2013
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 10/22/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 10/22/2013
Rep. Kelly, Robin L. [D-IL-2] 10/22/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 10/22/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8] 10/22/2013
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/22/2013
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 10/24/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11] 10/28/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 11/22/2013
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-16] 11/22/2013
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-42] 12/12/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 12/12/2013
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 12/12/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 01/27/2014
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-9] 01/27/2014
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-5] 01/27/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 01/27/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/05/2014
Rep. Hanabusa, Colleen W. [D-HI-1] 02/06/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 03/05/2014
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/26/2014
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/28/2014
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/28/2014
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 07/09/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-38] 07/22/2014
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 07/23/2014
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 11/12/2014
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 11/12/2014
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 11/17/2014
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-9] 11/18/2014
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 11/18/2014
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26] 11/18/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 12/01/2014
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/03/2014

Show cosponsors who withdrew