Refine your search

Showing 14 of 14 total for All Actions.
Date Chamber All Actions
12/09/2013 Senate Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: Senate
12/03/2013-12:46pm House On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7407)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
12/03/2013-12:36pm House DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1095.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
12/03/2013-12:36pm House Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7407-7409)
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
12/03/2013-12:35pm House Mr. McCaul moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
Type of Action: Floor Consideration
Action By: House of Representatives
11/21/2013 House Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 195.
Type of Action: Calendars
Action By: House of Representatives
11/21/2013 House Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 113-274.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Homeland Security
10/29/2013 House Subcommittee on Transportation Security Discharged.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Homeland Security
10/29/2013 House Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Homeland Security
10/29/2013 House Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Homeland Security
03/27/2013 House Referred to the Subcommittee on Transportation Security.
Type of Action: Committee Consideration
Action By: House Homeland Security
03/12/2013 House Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
03/12/2013 House Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives
03/12/2013 House Introduced in House
Type of Action: Introduction and Referral
Action By: House of Representatives