There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

TSA Loose Change Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

TSA Loose Change Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 49, United States Code, to direct the Assistant Secretary of Homeland Security (Transportation Security Administration) to transfer unclaimed money recovered at airport security checkpoints to nonprofit organizations that provide places of rest and recuperation at airports for members of the Armed Forces and their families, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
12/03/2013Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H7407)
11/21/2013Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 113-274.
03/12/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (13)

Date Chamber
12/09/2013SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
12/03/2013-12:46pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7407)
12/03/2013-12:36pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1095.
12/03/2013-12:36pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7407-7409)
12/03/2013-12:35pmHouseMr. McCaul moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
11/21/2013HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 195.
11/21/2013HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 113-274.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
10/29/2013HouseSubcommittee on Transportation Security Discharged.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
10/29/2013HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
10/29/2013HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
03/27/2013HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Transportation Security.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
03/12/2013HouseReferred to the House Committee on Homeland Security.
03/12/2013HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (43)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 04/17/2013
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 06/03/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 07/16/2013
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/16/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 07/16/2013
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1] 07/16/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 07/17/2013
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6] 07/17/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/17/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4] 07/17/2013
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/17/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/17/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/17/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 07/18/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/18/2013
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/18/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 07/19/2013
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/19/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 07/19/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 07/22/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1] 07/22/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/22/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 07/22/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/22/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/24/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 07/24/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 07/31/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 07/31/2013
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-4] 07/31/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 08/02/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/09/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 09/20/2013
Rep. Meehan, Patrick [R-PA-7] 09/25/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 09/26/2013
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-12] 09/26/2013
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 09/30/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/30/2013
Rep. Barber, Ron [D-AZ-2] 10/28/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/28/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 10/28/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 10/30/2013

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Homeland Security03/12/2013 Referred to
10/29/2013 Markup by
11/21/2013 Reported by H. Rept. 113-274
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Transportation Security03/27/2013 Referred to
10/29/2013 Discharged from
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation12/09/2013 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1095.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1095. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (12/03/2013)

TSA Loose Change Act - Directs the Assistant Secretary of Homeland Security (Transportation Security Administration [TSA] ) to transfer annually, based on requests for proposals, unclaimed money recovered at airport security checkpoints to nonprofit organizations that operate multiple airport centers throughout the United States to provide places of rest and recuperation for Armed Forces members and their families. (Currently, such moneys are retained by the TSA for civil aviation security.)

Amends the Department of Homeland Security Appropriations Act, 2005 to repeal the requirement that the TSA Administrator report annually to Congress on how unclaimed money is being used to provide civil aviation security. Requires the Administrator, instead, to report on the amount of money transferred to nonprofit organizations.