Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Ribble, Reid J. [R-WI-8]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Southerland, Steve II [R-FL-2]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Barletta, Lou [R-PA-11]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 03/15/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 03/15/2013
Rep. Gibbs, Bob [R-OH-7] 03/15/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 03/15/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 03/15/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 03/19/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/19/2013
Rep. Womack, Steve [R-AR-3] 03/20/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/12/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 04/12/2013
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-22] 04/26/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/06/2013
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/04/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14] 05/01/2014
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 05/07/2014
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/19/2014