Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 03/18/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/18/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 03/18/2013
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/18/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/18/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/18/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3] 03/18/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/18/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 03/25/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 03/25/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 04/09/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/09/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/12/2013
Rep. Labrador, Raul R. [R-ID-1] 04/16/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 07/22/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1] 07/23/2013