Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/12/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/13/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19] 03/13/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/13/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3] 03/14/2013
Rep. Takano, Mark [D-CA-41] 03/14/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/14/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 03/14/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/14/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 03/14/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 03/14/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20] 03/14/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 03/15/2013
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/15/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 03/19/2013
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 03/19/2013
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 03/19/2013
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 03/19/2013
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-17] 05/06/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 06/04/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 06/04/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 06/04/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/14/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/18/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/18/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 07/08/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/10/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 11/21/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 12/12/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/14/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 12/11/2014