Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 07/31/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/31/2013
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-4] 08/01/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 08/01/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 09/25/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/25/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/30/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 11/13/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 11/18/2013