Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34]* 03/13/2013
Rep. O'Rourke, Beto [D-TX-16]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Gallego, Pete P. [D-TX-23]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/14/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51] 03/19/2013
Rep. Nolan, Richard M. [D-MN-8] 10/29/2013
Rep. Williams, Roger [R-TX-25] 02/27/2014