Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Benishek, Dan [R-MI-1]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Black, Diane [R-TN-6]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-3]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND-At Large]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Flores, Bill [R-TX-17]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Hartzler, Vicky [R-MO-4]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Huelskamp, Tim [R-KS-1]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 03/13/2013
Rep. LaMalfa, Doug [R-CA-1]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Massie, Thomas [R-KY-4]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Mullin, Markwayne [R-OK-2]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Nunnelee, Alan [R-MS-1]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Pompeo, Mike [R-KS-4]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-5]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Weber, Randy K. Sr. [R-TX-14]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 03/15/2013
Rep. Rothfus, Keith J. [R-PA-12] 03/15/2013
Rep. Wagner, Ann [R-MO-2] 03/15/2013
Rep. Meadows, Mark [R-NC-11] 03/18/2013
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/18/2013
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/18/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 03/21/2013
Rep. Fincher, Stephen Lee [R-TN-8] 04/10/2013
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. Daines, Steve [R-MT-At Large] 04/10/2013
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 04/10/2013
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/12/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/16/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 06/18/2013
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 01/13/2014