There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Unlocking Consumer Choice and Wireless Competition Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

Unlocking Consumer Choice and Wireless Competition Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Unlocking Consumer Choice and Wireless Competition Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To promote consumer choice and wireless competition by permitting consumers to unlock mobile wireless devices, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
02/25/2014Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 295 - 114 (Roll no. 64).(text: CR H1904-1905)
02/25/2014Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 113-356.
03/13/2013Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
02/26/2014SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
02/25/2014-7:10pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 295 - 114 (Roll no. 64). (text: CR H1904-1905)
02/25/2014-7:02pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1922-1923)
02/25/2014-4:36pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
02/25/2014-3:55pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1123.
02/25/2014-3:55pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1904-1912)
02/25/2014-3:55pmHouseMr. Goodlatte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. (consideration: CR H1904)
02/25/2014HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 264.
02/25/2014HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 113-356.
07/31/2013HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
07/31/2013HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/22/2013HouseSubcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet Discharged.
06/06/2013HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet
04/15/2013HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, And The Internet.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/13/2013HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
03/13/2013HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/13/2013 Referred to
07/31/2013 Markup by
02/25/2014 Reported by H. Rept. 113-356
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet04/15/2013 Referred to
06/06/2013 Hearings by
07/22/2013 Discharged from
Senate Judiciary02/26/2014 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1123. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (02/25/2014)

Unlocking Consumer Choice and Wireless Competition Act - Repeals a Library of Congress (LOC) rulemaking determination, made upon the recommendation of the Register of Copyrights, regarding the circumvention of technological measures controlling access to copyrighted software on wireless telephone handsets (mobile telephones) for the purpose of connecting to different wireless telecommunications networks (a practice commonly referred to as "unlocking" such devices). Reestablishes, as an exemption to provisions of the Digital Millennium Copyright Act (DMCA) prohibiting such circumvention, a previous LOC rule permitting the use of computer programs, in the form of firmware or software, that enable used wireless telephone handsets to connect to a wireless telecommunications network, when circumvention is initiated by the owner of the copy of such computer program solely to connect to such a network and access to the network is authorized by the network operator, thus permitting unlocked phones.

Directs the Librarian of Congress, upon the recommendation of the Register, to determine whether to extend such exemption to include any other category of wireless devices in addition to wireless telephone handsets (e.g., tablets and other mobile broadband-enabled devices).

Allows such circumvention (unlocking) to be initiated by the owner of such a device, by another person at the direction of the owner, or by a provider of a commercial mobile radio service or a commercial mobile data service at the direction of such owner or other person, solely in order to enable such owner or a family member of such owner to connect to a wireless telecommunications network, when such connection is authorized by the operator of such network. Prohibits such owner-directed unlocking from being construed to: (1) permit the unlocking of devices for the purpose of bulk resale, or (2) authorize the Librarian to authorize circumvention for such purpose.