Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bass, Karen [D-CA-37]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-17]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-20]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-13]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24]* 03/13/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-13]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Payne, Donald M., Jr. [D-NJ-10]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Hahn, Janice [D-CA-44]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-20]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 03/13/2013
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/13/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-8]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Vargas, Juan [D-CA-51]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Keating, William R. [D-MA-9]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-28]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-23]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-26]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-19]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-25]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Meng, Grace [D-NY-6]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 03/14/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/14/2013
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-14] 03/14/2013
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 03/15/2013
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-9] 04/10/2013
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/10/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/10/2013
Rep. Veasey, Marc A. [D-TX-33] 05/17/2013
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 11/19/2013