Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Yoho, Ted S. [R-FL-3] 03/20/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/20/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/09/2013
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-20] 04/16/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 05/17/2013
Rep. Yoder, Kevin [R-KS-3] 05/21/2013
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/18/2013
Rep. Valadao, David G. [R-CA-21] 07/10/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/30/2013
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-21] 08/02/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 09/17/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 10/02/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 10/16/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 11/13/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/15/2013
Rep. Negrete McLeod, Gloria [D-CA-35] 11/21/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 12/03/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 12/03/2013
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 12/05/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 12/05/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 12/05/2013
Rep. Bustos, Cheri [D-IL-17] 02/11/2014
Rep. Pocan, Mark [D-WI-2] 02/21/2014
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/25/2014
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 03/25/2014
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/29/2014
Rep. Gibson, Christopher P. [R-NY-19] 05/01/2014
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 05/21/2014
Rep. Clark, Katherine M. [D-MA-5] 06/12/2014
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-24] 06/12/2014
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 06/18/2014
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/19/2014
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/08/2014
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-13] 07/08/2014
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/23/2014
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/31/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 09/18/2014
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 12/01/2014