Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Huizenga, Bill [R-MI-2] 03/14/2013
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/15/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/18/2013
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 04/12/2013
Rep. Bentivolio, Kerry L. [R-MI-11] 04/12/2013
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 06/12/2013