Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Bridenstine, Jim [R-OK-1]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/14/2013
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/14/2013
Rep. Roby, Martha [R-AL-2] 03/21/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/11/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/16/2013