Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Farenthold, Blake [R-TX-27] 04/25/2013
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-8] 05/09/2013
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 05/14/2013
Rep. Stockman, Steve [R-TX-36] 05/14/2013
Rep. Amodei, Mark E. [R-NV-2] 05/14/2013
Rep. Long, Billy [R-MO-7] 05/14/2013
Rep. Lowenthal, Alan S. [D-CA-47] 05/16/2013
Rep. Rice, Tom [R-SC-7] 05/17/2013
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-3] 05/17/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 05/21/2013
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-9] 05/21/2013
Rep. Walberg, Tim [R-MI-7] 05/22/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/22/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 05/23/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/23/2013
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/23/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 06/04/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/04/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/12/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 06/19/2013
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 06/19/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/19/2013
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/27/2013
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 07/09/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 07/16/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 10/29/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 01/28/2014
Rep. Garcia, Joe [D-FL-26] 03/26/2014
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-21] 04/09/2014
Rep. Cicilline, David N. [D-RI-1] 05/08/2014
Rep. Ross, Dennis A. [R-FL-15] 07/08/2014
Rep. Swalwell, Eric [D-CA-15] 07/08/2014
Rep. DeSantis, Ron [R-FL-6] 07/29/2014