Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Webster, Daniel [R-FL-10] 05/06/2013
Rep. Delaney, John K. [D-MD-6] 05/17/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 06/03/2013
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 06/26/2013
Rep. Maloney, Sean Patrick [D-NY-18] 09/17/2013