Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-3]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/09/2013
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/09/2013
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Brownley, Julia [D-CA-26] 04/09/2013
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/09/2013
Rep. Heck, Joseph J. [R-NV-3] 04/09/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/09/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 04/09/2013
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-13] 04/09/2013
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 04/09/2013
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-27] 04/11/2013
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-1] 04/16/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 04/18/2013
Rep. Kuster, Ann M. [D-NH-2] 05/07/2013
Rep. Schneider, Bradley S. [D-IL-10] 05/09/2013
Rep. Vela, Filemon [D-TX-34] 05/14/2013
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/22/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Huffman, Jared [D-CA-2] 06/04/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 02/04/2014
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 03/11/2014
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/24/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/24/2014
Rep. Kennedy, Joseph P. III [D-MA-4] 03/24/2014
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/26/2014
Rep. Horsford, Steven A. [D-NV-4] 03/26/2014
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/08/2014
Rep. Murphy, Patrick [D-FL-18] 04/08/2014
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/08/2014
Rep. Frankel, Lois [D-FL-22] 04/10/2014
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/28/2014
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-5] 04/28/2014
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/28/2014
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/28/2014
Rep. Noem, Kristi L. [R-SD-At Large] 04/28/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 04/29/2014
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/30/2014
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 05/07/2014
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 07/29/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 12/01/2014
Rep. Wilson, Frederica S. [D-FL-24] 12/11/2014