Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/11/2013
Rep. Griffith, H. Morgan [R-VA-9] 04/11/2013
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 04/26/2013
Rep. Nugent, Richard B. [R-FL-11] 05/08/2013
Rep. Lankford, James [R-OK-5] 05/22/2013
Rep. Holding, George [R-NC-13] 05/22/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 08/02/2013
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 08/02/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 09/19/2013
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/09/2014
Rep. Duncan, Jeff [R-SC-3] 01/09/2014