Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 03/13/2013
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/19/2013
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 03/21/2013
Rep. Bonamici, Suzanne [D-OR-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/25/2013
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/09/2013
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/09/2013
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/09/2013
Rep. Bucshon, Larry [R-IN-8] 04/10/2013
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/11/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/23/2013
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/06/2013
Rep. Rokita, Todd [R-IN-4] 05/08/2013
Rep. Brooks, Susan W. [R-IN-5] 05/08/2013
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/09/2013
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/09/2013
Rep. DesJarlais, Scott [R-TN-4] 05/17/2013
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/21/2013
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 05/21/2013
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 05/21/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/21/2013
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-10] 05/22/2013
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-10] 05/23/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/03/2013
Rep. Lujan Grisham, Michelle [D-NM-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Ruiz, Raul [D-CA-36] 06/03/2013
Rep. DelBene, Suzan K. [D-WA-1] 06/03/2013
Rep. Messer, Luke [R-IN-6] 06/10/2013
Rep. Barr, Andy [R-KY-6] 06/12/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 06/17/2013
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/18/2013
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-14] 07/18/2013
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/18/2013
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/18/2013
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/18/2013
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/18/2013
Rep. McKinley, David B. [R-WV-1] 07/22/2013
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 07/22/2013
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-2] 07/30/2013
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 08/01/2013
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-7] 08/02/2013
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-5] 08/02/2013
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 09/10/2013
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-18] 09/10/2013
Rep. Young, Todd C. [R-IN-9] 09/10/2013
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 09/10/2013
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-3] 09/10/2013
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/17/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 09/17/2013
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/17/2013
Rep. Walorski, Jackie [R-IN-2] 09/18/2013
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 09/18/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 09/25/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 09/28/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 10/11/2013
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-43] 10/16/2013
Rep. Joyce, David P. [R-OH-14] 10/29/2013
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 11/20/2013
Rep. Kildee, Daniel T [D-MI-5] 12/09/2013
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 12/09/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 12/09/2013
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/12/2013
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 12/19/2013
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 01/10/2014
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 01/10/2014
Rep. Wenstrup, Brad R. [R-OH-2] 01/27/2014
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 01/28/2014
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-2] 03/27/2014
Rep. Palazzo, Steven M. [R-MS-4] 03/27/2014
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/27/2014
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/07/2014
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 04/07/2014
Rep. Kilmer, Derek [D-WA-6] 05/08/2014
Rep. Beatty, Joyce [D-OH-3] 05/22/2014
Rep. Bera, Ami [D-CA-7] 05/22/2014
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/02/2014
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/26/2014
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/11/2014
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-40] 07/11/2014
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 11/12/2014
Rep. Heck, Denny [D-WA-10] 11/13/2014