Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/14/2013
Rep. Enyart, William L. [D-IL-12] 03/20/2013
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/21/2013
Rep. Sewell, Terri A. [D-AL-7] 03/21/2013
Rep. Davis, Rodney [R-IL-13] 03/25/2013
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-11] 03/25/2013
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 04/09/2013
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-15] 04/09/2013
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/09/2013
Rep. Johnson, Bill [R-OH-6] 04/11/2013
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 04/17/2013
Rep. Cartwright, Matt [D-PA-17] 04/18/2013
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/23/2013
Rep. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL-8] 04/26/2013
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/26/2013
Rep. Hultgren, Randy [R-IL-14] 05/07/2013
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 05/07/2013
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/07/2013
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/15/2013
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-3] 05/22/2013
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/03/2013
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/04/2013
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/05/2013
Rep. Kinzinger, Adam [R-IL-16] 06/13/2013
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/22/2013
Rep. Stivers, Steve [R-OH-15] 09/27/2013
Rep. Griffin, Tim [R-AR-2] 10/22/2013
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/23/2013
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 11/12/2013
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/28/2014